Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 504 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1843 Week
» 31341 Month
» 368187 Year
» 1589752 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2397
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 11/11/1938
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 16/08/1939
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 15/02/1949
Castle 5075 WELLINGTON 13/01/1950
Castle 5063 EARL BALDWIN 20/10/1950
Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE 22/06/1951