Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 367 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14410 Week
» 79364 Month
» 282028 Year
» 3308881 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2387
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5056 |
EARL OF POWIS |
22/05/1942 |
Castle |
5011 |
TINTAGEL CASTLE |
01/11/1948 |
Castle |
5075 |
WELLINGTON |
23/11/1950 |
Castle |
4078 |
PEMBROKE CASTLE |
23/09/1952 |
|