Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 377 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 377 Week
» 7182 Month
» 114128 Year
» 1335693 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4000
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5022 WIGMORE CASTLE 02/10/1946
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 13/11/1946
Castle 5075 WELLINGTON 19/02/1948
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 10/05/1950
Castle 5098 CLIFFORD CASTLE 08/02/1952
Castle 5078 BEAUFORT 17/03/1954
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 23/12/1955