Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 200 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18003 Week
» 71019 Month
» 190546 Year
» 3217399 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2417
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
20/03/1929 |
Castle |
4009 |
SHOOTING STAR |
12/05/1933 |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
02/09/1935 |
Castle |
5005 |
MANORBIER CASTLE |
07/08/1940 |
Castle |
7037 |
SWINDON |
25/08/1960 |
Castle |
7031 |
CROMWELL'S CASTLE |
09/02/1962 |
|