Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 436 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1775 Week
» 31273 Month
» 368119 Year
» 1589684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2542
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE 28/03/1930
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 11/08/1931
Castle 5025 CHIRK CASTLE 09/09/1937
Castle 4090 DORCHESTER CASTLE 17/01/1946
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 14/11/1947
Castle 5053 EARL CAIRNS 16/08/1949
Castle 4000 NORTH STAR 20/05/1950
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 13/10/1950