Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 405 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14448 Week
» 79402 Month
» 282066 Year
» 3308919 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2682
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5043 |
BARBURY CASTLE |
14/03/1936 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
17/10/1939 |
Castle |
5057 |
EARL WALDEGRAVE |
21/06/1941 |
Castle |
5090 |
NEATH ABBEY |
10/10/1942 |
Castle |
5065 |
NEWPORT CASTLE |
29/07/1943 |
Castle |
5012 |
BERRY POMEROY CASTLE |
13/07/1946 |
Castle |
5069 |
ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL |
27/03/1957 |
Castle |
7007 |
GREAT WESTERN |
09/08/1958 |
Castle |
5062 |
EARL OF SHAFTESBURY |
26/03/1959 |
|