Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 131 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 131 Week
» 18253 Month
» 187025 Year
» 1071406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2895
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 18/10/1944
Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE 11/04/1945
Castle 7011 BANBURY CASTLE 01/06/1950
Castle 5004 LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE 16/08/1951
Castle 7003 ELMLEY CASTLE 17/06/1952
Castle 5080 DEFIANT 28/04/1954
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 07/02/1955