Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2603
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4098 KIDWELLY CASTLE 09/06/1932
Castle 4037 QUEEN PHILIPPA 28/10/1935
Castle 5041 TIVERTON CASTLE 30/11/1942
Castle 5044 EARL OF DUNRAVEN 30/11/1942
Castle 5081 LOCKHEED HUDSON 17/01/1945
Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE 20/06/1947
Castle 5038 MORLAIS CASTLE 25/02/1949
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 23/01/1953
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 10/11/1953
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 09/02/1955
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 28/01/1957
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 03/03/1961