Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4510 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23421 Week
» 88375 Month
» 291039 Year
» 3317892 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2658
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5094 |
TRETOWER CASTLE |
02/06/1943 |
Castle |
5001 |
LLANDOVERY CASTLE |
22/10/1946 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
29/06/1953 |
Castle |
7031 |
CROMWELL'S CASTLE |
14/05/1958 |
|