Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 420 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1759 Week
» 31257 Month
» 368103 Year
» 1589668 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2584
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4037 QUEEN PHILIPPA 19/08/1931
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 31/01/1933
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 05/07/1933
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 28/06/1938
Castle 5075 WELLINGTON 26/06/1942
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 21/07/1943
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 21/03/1944
Castle 5056 EARL OF POWIS 11/02/1946
Castle 5066 WARDOUR CASTLE 04/09/1946
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 16/05/1950
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 13/10/1950
Castle 5069 ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL 19/12/1951
Castle 5049 EARL OF PLYMOUTH 14/12/1955
Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE 17/09/1956
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 18/09/1959
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 22/04/1961