Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 463 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1802 Week
» 31300 Month
» 368146 Year
» 1589711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2390
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 27/03/1931
Castle 4088 DARTMOUTH CASTLE 23/10/1931
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 28/06/1935
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 12/08/1936
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 26/02/1938
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 21/12/1938
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 10/06/1939
Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE 20/10/1961
Castle 5070 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 08/05/1964