Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 141 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1181 Week
» 11351 Month
» 289147 Year
» 1173528 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2441
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 29/05/1931
Castle 5007 ROUGEMONT CASTLE 04/03/1940
Castle 5054 EARL OF DUCIE 25/07/1941
Castle 5082 SWORDFISH 01/03/1943
Castle 5038 MORLAIS CASTLE 04/05/1943
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 21/05/1943
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 05/05/1944