Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 131 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 131 Week
» 18253 Month
» 187025 Year
» 1071406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2432
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 05/1929
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 23/06/1930
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 01/04/1933
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 13/08/1935
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 13/08/1935
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 10/06/1937
Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE 04/11/1939
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 21/11/1941
Castle 5097 SARUM CASTLE 26/08/1942
Castle 5052 EARL OF RADNOR 15/10/1943
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 15/08/1946
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 21/10/1947
Castle 5092 TRESCO ABBEY 13/01/1948
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 15/12/1948
Castle 100A1 LLOYD'S 13/08/1949