Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 858 Today
» 1285 Yesterday
» 3380 Week
» 31771 Month
» 157248 Year
» 233835 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2425
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 18/01/1940
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 22/01/1945
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 13/04/1948
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 22/07/1949
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 19/05/1951
Castle 5099 COMPTON CASTLE 17/08/1951
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 15/12/1952
Castle 7019 FOWEY CASTLE 12/08/1953