Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4080 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13654 Week
» 78608 Month
» 281272 Year
» 3308125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2698
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5036 |
LYONSHALL CASTLE |
09/02/1942 |
Castle |
5002 |
LUDLOW CASTLE |
12/09/1942 |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
06/11/1942 |
Castle |
5043 |
EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE |
19/11/1943 |
Castle |
5013 |
ABERGAVENNY CASTLE |
20/12/1946 |
Castle |
5093 |
UPTON CASTLE |
12/06/1948 |
Castle |
5041 |
TIVERTON CASTLE |
26/05/1961 |
Castle |
5044 |
EARL OF DUNRAVEN |
26/05/1961 |
|