Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 520 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18323 Week
» 71339 Month
» 190866 Year
» 3217719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2745
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4084 |
ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE |
10/07/1942 |
Castle |
5007 |
ROUGEMONT CASTLE |
18/05/1944 |
Castle |
5012 |
BERRY POMEROY CASTLE |
27/04/1945 |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
22/01/1947 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
23/06/1948 |
Castle |
5081 |
LOCKHEED HUDSON |
23/05/1950 |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
09/01/1952 |
Castle |
5074 |
HAMPDEN |
31/03/1953 |
Castle |
5058 |
EARL OF CLANCARTY |
08/04/1960 |
|