Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 366 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 1544 Week
» 1544 Month
» 190679 Year
» 1412244 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2926
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 17/06/1954
Castle 7037 SWINDON 27/01/1956
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 14/04/1960
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 22/12/1961