Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 309 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 309 Week
» 7114 Month
» 114060 Year
» 1335625 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4082
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 21/09/1951
Castle 5033 BROUGHTON CASTLE 30/09/1953
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 20/10/1956
Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE 02/08/1957
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 19/01/1962