Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 408 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14451 Week
» 79405 Month
» 282069 Year
» 3308922 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2409
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
02/03/1929 |
Castle |
5022 |
WIGMORE CASTLE |
29/05/1936 |
Castle |
5031 |
TOTNES CASTLE |
16/11/1937 |
Castle |
5092 |
TRESCO ABBEY |
31/07/1946 |
Castle |
4086 |
BUILTH CASTLE |
29/03/1950 |
Castle |
5057 |
EARL WALDEGRAVE |
31/08/1950 |
Castle |
5054 |
EARL OF DUCIE |
21/02/1951 |
Castle |
5005 |
MANORBIER CASTLE |
24/03/1951 |
Castle |
5093 |
UPTON CASTLE |
06/02/1952 |
Castle |
7016 |
CHESTER CASTLE |
10/07/1954 |
Castle |
5067 |
ST FAGANS CASTLE |
14/11/1956 |
|