Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 374 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 374 Week
» 7179 Month
» 114125 Year
» 1335690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2722
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 06/04/1937
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 21/06/1949
Castle 5057 EARL WALDEGRAVE 01/03/1951
Castle 5070 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 06/11/1951
Castle 5035 COITY CASTLE 16/06/1953
Castle 7010 AVONDALE CASTLE 21/12/1954
Castle 4037 THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS 10/09/1955
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 08/10/1955
Castle 5070 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 13/02/1959