Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2388
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5015 KINGSWEAR CASTLE 29/10/1935
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 11/07/1938
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 19/12/1939
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 12/12/1944
Castle 5089 WESTMINSTER ABBEY 12/10/1945
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 20/06/1947
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 15/05/1948
Castle 5094 TRETOWER CASTLE 12/06/1948
Castle 5007 ROUGEMONT CASTLE 18/02/1957
Castle 7014 CAERHAYS CASTLE 13/05/1957