Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2687
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 24/12/1937
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 27/06/1939
Castle 4088 DARTMOUTH CASTLE 14/04/1943
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 26/06/1944
Castle 5007 ROUGEMONT CASTLE 14/04/1948
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 04/11/1950
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 04/11/1961
Castle 5073 BLENHEIM 30/11/1961