Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1275 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19078 Week
» 72094 Month
» 191621 Year
» 3218474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2673
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5040 |
STOKESAY CASTLE |
25/06/1935 |
Castle |
5095 |
BARBURY CASTLE |
14/08/1943 |
Castle |
5085 |
EVESHAM ABBEY |
29/09/1943 |
Castle |
5036 |
LYONSHALL CASTLE |
18/03/1944 |
Castle |
5030 |
SHIRBURN CASTLE |
20/09/1944 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
19/06/1945 |
Castle |
4087 |
CARDIGAN CASTLE |
23/02/1946 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
18/05/1946 |
Castle |
5031 |
TOTNES CASTLE |
02/07/1946 |
|