Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1480 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14886 Week
» 67902 Month
» 187429 Year
» 3214282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2423
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4093 |
DUNSTER CASTLE |
14/03/1929 |
Castle |
5009 |
SHREWSBURY CASTLE |
14/10/1931 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
04/06/1932 |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
12/10/1933 |
Castle |
5016 |
MONTGOMERY CASTLE |
17/02/1945 |
Castle |
5006 |
TREGENNA CASTLE |
23/03/1946 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
29/11/1947 |
Castle |
5038 |
MORLAIS CASTLE |
27/05/1957 |
Castle |
4086 |
BUILTH CASTLE |
10/02/1958 |
Castle |
7029 |
CLUN CASTLE |
19/04/1958 |
|