Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 321 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 321 Week
» 7126 Month
» 114072 Year
» 1335637 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4124
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 12/01/1951
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 03/09/1952
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 21/08/1953
Castle 7008 SWANSEA CASTLE 12/04/1954
Castle 7025 SUDELEY CASTLE 29/10/1954
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 06/11/1961