Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4552 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20164 Week
» 118809 Month
» 321473 Year
» 3348326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2447
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4009 |
SHOOTING STAR |
28/11/1930 |
Castle |
4096 |
HIGHCLERE CASTLE |
25/05/1934 |
Castle |
5037 |
MONMOUTH CASTLE |
10/03/1937 |
Castle |
5085 |
EVESHAM ABBEY |
02/09/1941 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
12/10/1943 |
Castle |
4098 |
KIDWELLY CASTLE |
21/05/1949 |
Castle |
5061 |
EARL OF BIRKENHEAD |
19/10/1949 |
Castle |
7036 |
TAUNTON CASTLE |
02/07/1952 |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
24/01/1953 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
28/08/1953 |
|