Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 270 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 270 Week
» 7075 Month
» 114021 Year
» 1335586 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2688
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5057 EARL WALDEGRAVE 08/07/1938
Castle 5070 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 10/05/1944
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 22/04/1949
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 28/03/1958
Castle 5063 EARL BALDWIN 07/12/1959