Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1857 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15263 Week
» 68279 Month
» 187806 Year
» 3214659 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2861
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5008 |
RAGLAN CASTLE |
30/12/1947 |
Castle |
5082 |
SWORDFISH |
22/07/1949 |
Castle |
7007 |
GREAT WESTERN |
03/07/1951 |
Castle |
4096 |
HIGHCLERE CASTLE |
12/03/1958 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
22/01/1960 |
|