Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 460 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1799 Week
» 31297 Month
» 368143 Year
» 1589708 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2545
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 13/05/1930
Castle 4000 NORTH STAR 29/07/1931
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 02/10/1943
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 03/01/1956