Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2591
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 111 VISCOUNT CHURCHILL 28/10/1931
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 07/02/1934
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 22/10/1934
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 22/10/1934
Castle A1 LLOYD'S 24/01/1936
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 17/10/1936
Castle 5008 RAGLAN CASTLE 30/04/1937
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 10/12/1940
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 20/05/1941
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 06/09/1941
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 31/08/1943
Castle 5018 ST MAWES CASTLE 12/01/1945
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 28/05/1946
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 22/09/1950
Castle 7021 HAVERFORDWEST CASTLE 30/01/1958
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 14/12/1959