Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2384
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 09/1926
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 20/02/1937
Castle 5097 SARUM CASTLE 03/07/1946
Castle 5053 EARL CAIRNS 01/04/1948
Castle 5085 EVESHAM ABBEY 27/04/1957
Castle 4088 DARTMOUTH CASTLE 12/1961