Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 646 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7207 Week
» 28109 Month
» 28109 Year
» 1249674 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2856
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 23/05/1941
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 08/07/1941
Castle 4094 DYNEVOR CASTLE 07/08/1947
Castle 5074 HAMPDEN 19/05/1949
Castle 5092 TRESCO ABBEY 26/10/1950
Castle 5078 BEAUFORT 16/11/1951
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 09/10/1952
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 25/02/1954
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 01/02/1955