Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 284 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3523 Week
» 16036 Month
» 104228 Year
» 988609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2535
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5020 TREMATON CASTLE 26/05/1937
Castle 5072 COMPTON CASTLE 25/05/1940
Castle 5034 CORFE CASTLE 14/02/1942
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 23/04/1942
Castle 5081 LOCKHEED HUDSON 27/01/1943
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 01/04/1947
Castle 5040 STOKESAY CASTLE 18/12/1956
Castle 7035 OGMORE CASTLE 29/05/1958
Castle 7010 AVONDALE CASTLE 09/08/1958
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 16/05/1959