Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 795 Today
» 975 Yesterday
» 795 Week
» 22503 Month
» 285480 Year
» 362067 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2674
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 03/07/1935
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 05/03/1938
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 14/02/1942
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 20/08/1943
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 08/04/1944
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 14/11/1952
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 08/09/1954
Castle 5038 MORLAIS CASTLE 21/05/1955
Castle 5016 MONTGOMERY CASTLE 29/11/1955
Castle 5010 RESTORMEL CASTLE 17/05/1956
Castle 7011 BANBURY CASTLE 15/05/1957
Castle 5041 TIVERTON CASTLE 04/10/1958
Castle 5044 EARL OF DUNRAVEN 04/10/1958