Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2558
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 14/07/1930
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 24/06/1931
Castle 5018 ST MAWES CASTLE 10/11/1936
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 30/12/1937
Castle 5065 NEWPORT CASTLE 26/07/1939
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 29/07/1939
Castle 5066 WARDOUR CASTLE 18/04/1941
Castle 5074 HAMPDEN 25/02/1942
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 23/05/1942
Castle 5094 TRETOWER CASTLE 16/06/1945
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 08/10/1946
Castle 7001 SIR JAMES MILNE 21/10/1953
Castle 7037 SWINDON 25/05/1955
Castle 7007 GREAT WESTERN 23/01/1958
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 05/01/1960