Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 48 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3191 Week
» 13361 Month
» 291157 Year
» 1175538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2639
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 01/02/1941
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 22/01/1943
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 08/02/1947
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 19/08/1948