Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 129 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 129 Week
» 18251 Month
» 187023 Year
» 1071404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4043
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 24/01/1950
Castle 7023 PENRICE CASTLE 13/02/1951
Castle 7015 CARN BREA CASTLE 20/09/1951
Castle 5067 ST FAGANS CASTLE 01/02/1952
Castle 4098 KIDWELLY CASTLE 22/01/1953
Castle 7007 GREAT WESTERN 13/01/1955
Castle 7016 CHESTER CASTLE 06/10/1958
Castle 5095 BARBURY CASTLE 08/09/1960