Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2876
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5076 GLADIATOR 28/09/1949
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 21/02/1951
Castle 7007 GREAT WESTERN 02/03/1952
Castle 7024 POWIS CASTLE 02/01/1953
Castle 7015 CARN BREA CASTLE 14/11/1956
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 23/02/1957