Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 643 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7204 Week
» 28106 Month
» 28106 Year
» 1249671 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2725
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5061 SUDELEY CASTLE 12/06/1937
Castle 5079 LYSANDER 23/08/1941
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 26/01/1944
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 01/09/1947
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 17/11/1949
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 05/09/1951
Castle 7001 SIR JAMES MILNE 24/11/1952
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 13/10/1953
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 05/01/1955
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 19/12/1955
Castle 5095 BARBURY CASTLE 06/10/1956