Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4013
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 07/03/1950
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 27/04/1951
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 18/06/1952
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 29/05/1958
Castle 5054 EARL OF DUCIE 26/12/1959
Castle 5085 EVESHAM ABBEY 20/05/1962
Castle 7024 POWIS CASTLE 05/12/1962