Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2781
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5079 LYDFORD CASTLE 19/05/1939
Castle 5020 TREMATON CASTLE 22/10/1940
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 27/02/1942
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 20/08/1943
Castle 5065 NEWPORT CASTLE 08/06/1944
Castle 5054 EARL OF DUCIE 23/11/1944
Castle 5072 HURRICANE 23/02/1946
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 09/02/1960