Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1775 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15181 Week
» 68197 Month
» 187724 Year
» 3214577 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2752
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
14/02/1940 |
Castle |
5063 |
EARL BALDWIN |
08/01/1941 |
Castle |
5093 |
UPTON CASTLE |
22/12/1941 |
Castle |
5052 |
EARL OF RADNOR |
12/09/1958 |
|