Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3653 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17059 Week
» 70075 Month
» 189602 Year
» 3216455 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2857
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
21/10/1943 |
Castle |
4084 |
ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE |
05/11/1945 |
Castle |
4096 |
HIGHCLERE CASTLE |
23/11/1945 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
15/05/1948 |
Castle |
5058 |
EARL OF CLANCARTY |
11/08/1958 |
|