Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2994 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16400 Week
» 69416 Month
» 188943 Year
» 3215796 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2764
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5077 |
EASTNOR CASTLE |
15/08/1938 |
Castle |
5034 |
CORFE CASTLE |
03/01/1943 |
Castle |
5088 |
LLANTHONY ABBEY |
19/03/1945 |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
12/07/1952 |
Castle |
5089 |
WESTMINSTER ABBEY |
28/10/1957 |
|