Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1176 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 2407 Week
» 14112 Month
» 345601 Year
» 422188 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2579
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 27/03/1935
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 09/06/1936
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 20/12/1937
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 27/05/1942
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 18/04/1943
Castle 5079 LYSANDER 06/03/1944
Castle 5023 BRECON CASTLE 10/08/1945
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 06/09/1952