Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 598 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6575 Week
» 22773 Month
» 187673 Year
» 698775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2840
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE 21/11/1950
Castle 5036 LYONSHALL CASTLE 02/03/1952
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 26/05/1953
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 09/03/1954
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 16/07/1955
Castle 5074 HAMPDEN 18/10/1961