Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1085 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1085 Week
» 3667 Month
» 268300 Year
» 1489865 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2814
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 05/03/1940
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 20/06/1942
Castle 5085 EVESHAM ABBEY 03/05/1945
Castle 5083 BATH ABBEY 15/01/1947
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 08/02/1949
Castle 5014 GOODRICH CASTLE 01/11/1950
Castle 5056 EARL OF POWIS 01/08/1952
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 19/02/1960