Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2823
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5013 |
ABERGAVENNY CASTLE |
26/05/1945 |
Castle |
4085 |
BERKELEY CASTLE |
06/06/1946 |
Castle |
5048 |
EARL OF DEVON |
30/11/1946 |
Castle |
4098 |
KIDWELLY CASTLE |
16/07/1949 |
Castle |
5078 |
BEAUFORT |
30/11/1949 |
Castle |
5043 |
EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE |
16/05/1958 |
|