Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 1208 Yesterday
» 1322 Week
» 25283 Month
» 188337 Year
» 264924 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2794
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 16/09/1939
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 06/04/1940
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 27/01/1945
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 04/10/1949
Castle 7018 DRYSLLWYN CASTLE 03/05/1951
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 03/1962