Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 607 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6212 Week
» 17759 Month
» 417441 Year
» 494028 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4032
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 14/10/1949
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 19/05/1951
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 20/08/1951
Castle 5076 GLADIATOR 29/05/1952
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 09/02/1953
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 11/07/1953